Financial history EDUCATION FOR EVERYONE

Charity number: 1172424
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £4.62k £1.25k £16.47k £4.02k £1.13k
Total expenditure £4.51k £1.10k £15.96k £1.86k £160
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A