LINACRE BRIDGE COMMUNITY HUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Welfare Rights Advice Sessions (by appointment), Weight Wathchers Classes, Yoga Sessions, Pensioners Luncheon Club, Youth Club, Growing Collective, Gardening Projects, Community Events, Alzheimer's Activity Groups, Councillors Surgeries, Police Drop In, ASB Officer, Signposting, Food Distribution. All center based and some working in partnership with other voluntary groups/public sector bodies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sefton
Governance
- 07 June 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin James Kilpatrick | Chair | 12 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANET MCCUSKER | Trustee | 07 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE MARGARET WALKER | Trustee | 07 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
JEAN ELEANOR HOLT | Trustee | 07 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.25k | £89.97k | £10.84k | £44.45k | £27.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.35k | £114.54k | £48.38k | £46.57k | £31.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 14 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 14 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 15 May 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 15 May 2024 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 May 2023 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 10 May 2023 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 09 May 2022 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 09 May 2022 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Jun 2017
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF THE SOUTH SEFTON COMMUNITY, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Linacre Bridge Community Hub
Bootle
LIVERPOOL
L20 5DW
- Phone:
- 0151 287 6680
- Email:
- linacrehub@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window