Financial history SPARKS CARDIFF CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1174363
Charity reporting is overdue by 114 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £201.41k £59.19k £6.43k £2.66k £7.00k
Total expenditure £158.54k £98.26k £4.68k £2.86k £5.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £5.00k N/A N/A