SPARKS CARDIFF CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The primary activities of the charity shall be fundraising via events including, but not restricted to, an annual fireworks display. Funds raised shall be distributed by way of grants and donations to charities and good causes in Cardiff and the surrounding geographic areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Caerphilly
- Cardiff
- Newport City
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 24 August 2017: CIO registration
- 23 October 2018: Funds received from 514605 THE CHARITABLE FUND OF ROUND TABLE NUMBER 26
- SPARKS CRT 26 (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeff Stephen Barry | Chair | 08 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jason Lee Ford | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £201.41k | £59.19k | £6.43k | £2.66k | £7.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £158.54k | £98.26k | £4.68k | £2.86k | £5.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2025 | 365 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2025 | 365 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 24 Aug 2017
Charitable objects
THE PRIMARY OBJECTIVES OF THE CIO SHALL BE: I.FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF THOSE IN POVERTY OR IN FINANCIAL NEED IN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY DUE TO FINANCIAL CIRCUMSTANCE OR UNFORESEEN HARDSHIP BY WAY OF PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE OR REQUIRED MATERIALS; II.FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE REDUCTION OF DISEASE OR MORTALITY TO THOSE IN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY DUE TO PREVENTABLE ILLNESS BY WAY OF PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE OR REQUIRED EQUIPMENT; III.TO ADVANCE THE PURPOSES AND FACILITIES OF AMATEUR SPORTS ORGANISATIONS WITHIN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY WHERE SUPPORT IS REQUIRED BY WAY OF PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, MATERIALS OR EQUIPMENT AS REQUIRED; IV.FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF ANY OTHER INDIVIDUAL IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP WITHIN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY WHERE SUPPORT IS REQUIRED BY WAY OF PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, MATERIALS OR EQUIPMENT AS REQUIRED; AND V.TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Birchwood Road
CARDIFF
CF23 5LJ
- Phone:
- 07889474764
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window