FAVERSHAM ASSISTANCE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to support elderly and disabled people who are financially challenged: to live independently for longer in their own homes. (FACE) Faversham Assistance Centre is a local charity based in Faversham, Kent. We offer practical help in the form of garden maintenance and decorating to people who are unable to carry out these tasks for themselves
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- FACE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHANIE WOLFE | Chair | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Adams | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Margaret Mulford | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham John Dorkins | Trustee | 30 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Elizabeth Negus | Trustee | 30 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.06k | £54.05k | £58.22k | £51.15k | £69.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.94k | £43.11k | £47.98k | £54.84k | £63.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £17.37k | £19.53k | £22.32k | £6.70k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Apr 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: THE CIO IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE RELIEF OF THE AGED AND THE DISABLED IN THE AREA COMPRISING FAVERSHAM AND ITS SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD. (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE "AREA OF BENEFIT"). IN FURTHERANCE OF THE SAID PURPOSES BUT NOT OTHERWISE THE CIO THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL HAVE THE FOLLOWING POWERS. 1 TO PROVIDE PRACTICAL ASSISTANCE FOR THE ELDERLY AND DISABLED IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 2 TO PROVIDE A SIGNPOSTING SERVICE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.3 TO CO-OPERATE WITH THE DEPARTMENT OF WORKS AND PENSIONS, KENT COUNTY COUNCIL SWALE BOROUGH COUNCIL, FAVERSHAM TOWN COUNCIL AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS, STATUTORY AND VOLUNTARY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.4 TO PROMOTE THE EXISTENCE OF THE CIO IN THE CHURCHES, PUBLIC LIBRARIES, HEALTH CENTRES AND OTHER FREELY AVAILABLE PLACES IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 5 TO RAISE FUNDS AND TO INVITE AND RECEIVE CONTRIBUTIONS FROM ANY PERSON OR PERSONS WHATSOEVER BY WAY OF DONATIONS. 6. TO ACQUIRE, BY PURCHASE, GIFT OR OTHERWISE, PROPERTY WHETHER SUBJECT TO ANY SPECIAL TRUST OR NOT.NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Faversham Assistance Centre
The Old Fire Station
Crescent Road
Faversham
ME13 7GU
- Phone:
- 07483150330
- Email:
- favassistants@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window