THE BERROW COTTAGE HOMES

Charity Number: 1175027
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of social housing by way of almshouses

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £208,581
Total expenditure: £154,409

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Solihull

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 March 1967: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Homes England
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Claire Lewthwaite Trustee 24 February 2021
ARDEN SCHOOL PARENTS TEACHERS FRIENDS ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Julia Hogg Trustee 21 October 2020
None on record
Rev Geoffrey Lanham Trustee 30 October 2019
None on record
NEIL JOHN CAMERON Trustee 31 December 2018
None on record
DAVID WHITING Trustee 31 December 2018
None on record
TERENCE JOHN CORNS Trustee 31 December 2018
None on record
ROBERT WILLIAM PITT Trustee 31 December 2018
None on record
ELISABETH MARY WILKIN Trustee 31 December 2018
None on record
CHARLES EDWARD PONTIFEX Trustee 31 December 2018
None on record
Dr JENNIFER ANN HAGON Trustee 31 December 2018
HENLEY IN ARDEN AND DISTRICT DEMENTIA CAFE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £222.33k £176.66k £185.02k £204.04k £208.58k
Total expenditure £128.51k £148.79k £160.55k £170.23k £154.41k
Income from government contracts £3.85k £3.92k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 16 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 10 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED IN P.R 14 MARCH 1923 (U.V.224 P.258)
Charitable objects
THE MAINTENANCE OF THE BERROW COTTAGE HOMES OR FOR AN ENDOWMENT FUND FOR THE SUPPORT OF THE INMATES OR FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF THE TRUST.
Area of benefit
KNOWLE
Registration history
  • 30 March 1967 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
2 Kenilworth Road
Knowle
Solihull
B93 0JA
Phone:
01564778337