LIVE TOGETHER LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LUTON TIGERS is a unique organisation: as a charity we work hard to protect our kids from radicalisation,extremism and racism. From sports classes to workshops our activities empower children of all backgrounds to find their own voice. We believe critical thinking is key to make them understand that we may look different, but in reality we're all alike. It's our common Lutonian identity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 23 January 2018: Standard registration
- LUTON TIGERS LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KHALID ALI | Chair | 24 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
ABDUL ROB | Trustee | 24 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
AFJOL HUSSAIN | Trustee | 24 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
SHARON ZAMAN | Trustee | 24 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £165.38k | £115.86k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £188.19k | £123.56k | £650 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £165.38k | £115.86k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 July 2023 | 163 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2022 | 290 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2022 | 290 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 November 2022 | 655 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 November 2022 | 655 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 MAR 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22 JAN 2018 as amended on 29 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (“OBJECTS”) ARE: TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN LUTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FARLEY COMMUNITY CENTRE
DELPHINE CLOSE
LUTON
LU1 5RE
- Phone:
- 07878546450
- Email:
- shaz@lutontigers.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window