NEPTUNE'S ARMY OF RUBBISH CLEANERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- Find, record and responsibly dispose of underwater litter from the sea/freshwaters of Pembrokeshire and when applicable other regions with volunteer divers; -Collect data on the distribution, nature and amount of underwater litter and its environmental impacts; -Spread awareness of the presence of marine litter and the environmental threats it causes;Educate the public to reduce marine litter;
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 31 July 2017: CIO registration
- NARC (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID KENNARD | Chair | 31 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Roch | Trustee | 25 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Justin Collins | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Miles Alistair McLaren Bettridge | Trustee | 24 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mari Claire Williams | Trustee | 29 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
BLAISE BULLIMORE | Trustee | 31 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Jones | Trustee | 31 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.41k | £8.69k | £22.38k | £7.75k | £7.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.53k | £2.98k | £7.13k | £13.31k | £11.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 February 2022 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2022 | 365 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 Jul 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PRESERVE AND IMPROVE THE MARINE ENVIRONMENT IN WEST WALES BY, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: 1) LOCATING, DOCUMENTING, RETRIEVING AND RESPONSIBLY DISPOSING OF UNDERWATER DEBRIS FROM THE SEA AND FRESHWATERS OF PEMBROKESHIRE AND WHERE APPLICABLE OTHER REGIONS USING VOLUNTEER DIVERS; 2) COLLECTING DATA ON THE DISTRIBUTION, NATURE AND AMOUNT OF UNDERWATER DEBRIS AND ITS ENVIRONMENTAL IMPACTS; 3) SPREADING AWARENESS OF THE PRESENCE OF UNDERWATER MARINE LITTER AND THE ENVIRONMENTAL THREATS IT CAUSES; 4) EDUCATING WATER USERS AND THE PUBLIC SO AS TO REDUCE THE INPUT OF DEBRIS TO THE SEA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Richmond Crescent
HAVERFORDWEST
Dyfed
SA61 1EH
- Phone:
- 07922423546
- Email:
- waveyjones73@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window