OPERAGLASS WORKS LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mount productions of high quality opera
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 August 2017: Standard registration
- 05 October 2022: Funds received from 280835 THE JOYCE GRENFELL MEMORIAL TRUST
- OPERAGLASS WORKS LTD (Working name)
- OPERAGLASS WORKS (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor RICHARD KAPLAN MD, FACP | Chair | 10 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
ANNA HORSBRUGH-PORTER | Trustee | 21 July 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev SIMON ACLAND | Trustee | 20 July 2017 |
|
|||||||||
ELIZA THOMPSON | Trustee | 10 April 2017 |
|
|||||||||
SELINA CADELL | Trustee | 10 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.80k | £196.37k | £101.88k | £59.74k | £339.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.73k | £227.46k | £129.35k | £45.90k | £648.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 17 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 17 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 NOV 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 APR 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 JUL 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21 AUG 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS IN PARTICULAR THE ARTS OF OPERA AND THEATRE BY THE PRODUCTION OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCES OF HIGH QUALITY OPERA AND THEATRE IN THE UK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
DEACONS
THE STABLES
WIDDINGTON
SAFFRON WALDEN
CB11 3SU
- Phone:
- 07740436561
- Email:
- info@operaglassworks.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window