FRATERNITY WITHOUT BORDERS UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of poverty in Mozambique, particularly but not exclusively by the provision of grants to charities or other organisations working to prevent or relieve poverty in Mozambique; and the advancement of such other charitable purpose (according to the law of England and Wales) in Mozambique as the trustees see fit from time to time.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Mozambique
Governance
- 06 July 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GILSON GUIMARAES | Chair | 06 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rudgerio Rossi Fermo | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Silvia Rossi-Fermo | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Beatriz Rocha | Trustee | 14 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
MRS CRISTINE BALARINE | Trustee | 06 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.03k | £21.79k | £59.73k | £46.79k | £22.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.99k | £21.75k | £57.35k | £46.56k | £19.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 May 2024 | 98 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 February 2021 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 February 2021 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Jul 2017 as amended on 13 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
3.1 The objects of the CIO are for the public benefit: 3.2 the relief of poverty anywhere in the world, particularly but not exclusively by the provision of grants to charities or other organisations working with children and young people in Mozambique; 3.3 the advancement of such other charitable purpose (according to the law of England and Wales) in Mozambique and the UK as the trustees see fit from time to time.
Contact information
- Address:
-
167-169 Great Portland street
5th Floor
W1W 5PF
- Phone:
- 07841402336
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window