POVERTY ALLEVIATION SCHOLARSHIPS FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The prevention and relief of poverty in developing countries
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Pakistan
Governance
- 11 December 2017: Standard registration
- 20 February 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 20 February 2024: Funds transferred to 1004608 QED FOUNDATION LIMITED
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £17.33k | £200 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.36k | £3.45k | £1.96k | £7.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 December 2020 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 DEC 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ('OBJECTS') ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES (IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY PAKISTAN) BY THE FOLLOWING: (I) PROVIDING SCHOLARSHIPS TO ENABLE YOUNG MEN AND WOMEN FROM POOR FAMILIES TO ACQUIRE VOCATIONAL SKILLS AND NATIONALLY OR INTERNATIONALLY RECOGNISED QUALIFICATIONS LEADING TO EMPLOYMENT, SELF-EMPLOYMENT OR SOCIAL ENTREPRENEURSHIP. (II) HELPING PEOPLE IN FINANCIAL HARDSHIP TO FIND JOBS IN THEIR HOME COUNTRIES OR ABROAD OR TO SET UP BUSINESSES AND SOCIAL ENTERPRISES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window