THE TAMARITANS THEATRE COMPANY

Charity Number: 1174999
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To educate the public in the dramatic arts.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £25,392
Total expenditure: £18,465

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall
  • Devon
  • Plymouth City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 October 2017: CIO registration
  • 01 May 2019: Funds received from 274244 THE TAMARITANS THEATRE COMPANY
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rachel Mary White Trustee 18 February 2025
None on record
Matthew Stephen Becker Trustee 03 September 2024
None on record
Vince William Sutton Trustee 07 February 2024
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £15.44k £13.72k £21.19k £21.16k £25.39k
Total expenditure £8.28k £13.51k £15.06k £20.46k £18.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £9.46k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 17 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 17 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 30 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 16 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 04 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Flat 50
55 Cliff Road
PLYMOUTH
PL1 2PE
Phone:
01752 313663