ELIZABETH MONTAGU CORRESPONDENCE ONLINE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity advances education for the public benefit by publishing an online edition of the letters of Elizabeth Montagu, her correspondents and other members of her circle, as a means to advance scholarship and literary and historical research by making the online correspondence archive freely available for use as an educational tool.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 September 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor CAROLINE FRANKLIN | Chair | 18 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Joanna Barker | Trustee | 18 September 2017 |
|
|||||||||
Dr ELIZABETH EGER | Trustee | 18 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Professor NICOLE POHL | Trustee | 18 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.06k | £41.00k | £42.31k | £10.01k | £29.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.74k | £43.54k | £37.31k | £23.64k | £16.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 19 June 2024 | 80 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 03 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 03 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Sep 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PUBLISHING AN ONLINE EDITION OF THE LETTERS OF ELIZABETH MONTAGU, HER CORRESPONDENTS AND OTHER MEMBERS OF HER CIRCLE (“THE MONTAGU CORRESPONDENCE”) IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AS A MEANS TO: A) ADVANCE SCHOLARSHIP AND LITERARY AND HISTORICAL RESEARCH BY MAKING THE ONLINE CORRESPONDENCE ARCHIVE AVAILABLE FOR USE AS AN EDUCATIONAL TOOL BY ACADEMIC INSTITUTIONS AND INTERESTED MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC; B) ENCOURAGE SCHOLARS AND RESEARCHERS TO TRANSCRIBE, EDIT, STUDY AND PUBLISH MATERIALS ARISING FROM THE ONLINE CORRESPONDENCE ARCHIVE, AND TO PROVIDE THEM WITH SCHOLARSHIPS, EXPENSE REIMBURSEMENT AND OTHER FORMS OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE FOR THIS PURPOSE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CREEK HOUSE
FISHERY ROAD
MAIDENHEAD
SL6 1UN
- Phone:
- 01628778060
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window