Accounts and annual returns THE MELLOR AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 510067
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 January 2025 350 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 15 January 2025 350 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 October 2024 637 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 29 October 2024 637 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 August 2022 192 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

11 August 2022 192 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window