THE MELLOR AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the benefit of those living in Mellor and it's surrounding area through the provision or facilitation of social, recreational and leisure services. To secure and maintain a community centre and co-operate with other local 3rd parties so as to promote it's use.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lancashire
Governance
- 28 May 1980: Standard registration
- MELLOR VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael John Venables | Chair | 26 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janice Marie Wylie | Trustee | 26 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN HARGREAVES | Trustee | 21 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Graham | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Brown | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Cousins | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Norman Bryson Roberts | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Andrew Wallace | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.68k | £26.36k | £38.50k | £53.74k | £43.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.10k | £14.50k | £20.65k | £80.00k | £52.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.67k | £8.42k | £4.20k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2025 | 350 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2025 | 350 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 October 2024 | 637 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 October 2024 | 637 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 August 2022 | 192 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
11 August 2022 | 192 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29/09/1976 AS AMENDED ON 24/05/1978 AS AMENDED ON 14/05/1991 AS AMENDED ON 26/04/2012
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF MELLOR AND DISTRICT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE, OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
MELLOR AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mellor Community Association
Village Hall
Mellor Lane
Mellor
BLACKBURN
BB2 7EW
- Phone:
- 07561538314
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window