Financial history MANCHESTER MALAYALEE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1175205
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £36.25k £7.01k £7.44k £19.66k £33.00k
Total expenditure £30.37k £6.24k £5.62k £16.32k £33.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A