Trustees MANCHESTER MALAYALEE ASSOCIATION
Charity Number: 1175205

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pranab Kachappilly Francis | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mridula Menon Nedungalaparambil | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Shinto Tom | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Delim Hussain | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mathew Kurian | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jipsa Joseph | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rakesh Aravindakshan | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Bibin Abraham | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Roncy Joseph | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anoop THAZHATHUPARAYANOLICKAL KUNHANAND | Trustee | 27 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Priyanka Anakkathil | Trustee | 27 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sachu James | Trustee | 27 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Arunchand Gopalakrishnan Unnithan | Trustee | 28 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
George Vadakkumchery Variathu | Trustee | 12 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
SHAJIMON DAMODARAN KULATHUMKAL | Trustee | 30 January 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.