P.A.T.H TORBAY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Path Torbay runs a food and support service from 172 Union Street, Torquay. Anyone facing homelessness and crisis in Torbay is welcome to this drop in service 5 days a week, Mon - Fri 1pm - 6pm. PATH provides packed lunches, toiletries and equipment. PATH is a member of the Torbay Food Alliance and runs a busy emergency food bank for anyone struggling in Torbay.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £65,264 from 5 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Torbay
Governance
- 15 May 2017: Standard registration
- 05 August 2020: Funds received from 1098949 MASH (MUTUAL AID AND SELF HELP)
- PATH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Gingell | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Castle | Trustee | 05 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ann Jenkins | Trustee | 05 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Polly Jurksaitis | Trustee | 05 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Hannuth-Savill | Trustee | 05 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Price | Trustee | 13 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kath Katherine | Trustee | 06 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.90k | £126.59k | £100.80k | £37.77k | £90.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.90k | £125.14k | £65.22k | £66.22k | £67.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.50k | £75.33k | £66.00k | £22.00k | £65.26k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 13 June 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 04 July 2024 | 126 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 25 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 08 March 2023 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 04 April 2022 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 04 April 2022 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06 MAR 2017 AS AMENDED ON 25 APR 2017
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN TORBAY AMONG PEOPLE WHO ARE HOMELESS OR MAY SOON BE HOMELESS OR WHO ARE INADEQUATELY HOUSED BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ADVICE REGARDING ACCOMMODATION AND ESSENTIAL ITEMS SUCH AS FOOD, ITEMS AND FACILITIES FOR HYGIENE AND OTHER BASIC NEEDS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS OR CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
172 Union Street
TORQUAY
TQ2 5QP
- Phone:
- 07763398238
- Email:
- Pathtorbay@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window