Trustees JESSIE HUGHES INSTITUTE
Charity number: 510073

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Wright | Trustee | 24 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Holloway | Trustee | 24 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brian Purchas | Trustee | 24 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
HELEN HUTCHINSON | Trustee | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL HUTCHINSON | Trustee | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA HOLLOWAY | Trustee | 29 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
WENDY PARKER | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
NICK PARKER | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BAILEY | Trustee | 08 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR BERT PLATT | Trustee | 08 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MENZIES FREEMAN | Trustee | 08 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
MRS JAN FREEMAN | Trustee | 08 May 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.