Financial history BRITISH NUCLEAR TEST VETERANS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1173575
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £146.65k £33.79k £76.01k £28.89k £19.00k
Total expenditure £61.12k £114.47k £88.62k £52.63k £15.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £20.00k N/A N/A