THE BRECON TOWN CONCERT BAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The encouragement of more widespread performance of Wind Band music thoughout the Brecon and surrounding area. The training of young musicians.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 19 August 2023
Total income includes £750 from 1 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Blaenau Gwent
- Cardiff
- Devon
- Powys
Governance
- 28 May 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carla Rapoport BA | Chair | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bronwen Frow-Jones | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Alison Jane Linington | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ruth Joynes | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martha Sian Powell | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Elizabeth Denney | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Stephen Woods MA MSc | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Anne Metcalfe | Trustee | 20 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
EMMA PROSSER BA HONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAVIS DOROTHY AHERN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATHRYN POWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID JOHN JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 19/08/2019 | 19/08/2020 | 19/08/2021 | 19/08/2022 | 19/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.51k | £9.99k | £12.24k | £6.77k | £13.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.53k | £6.82k | £5.75k | £9.21k | £13.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £900 | N/A | £750 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 19 August 2023 | 14 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 August 2022 | 05 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 August 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 August 2020 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 August 2019 | 26 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 APRIL 1980
Charitable objects
TO FOSTER AN PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE APPRECIATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF MUSIC, IN PARTICULAR THE ART OF SYMPHONIC WIND BAND PLAYING IN THE TOWN OF BRECON, AND TO PROMOTE BETTER AND MORE WIDESPREAD PERFORMANCES OF INSTRUMENTAL WORKS.
Area of benefit
BRECON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Waterfalls Cottage
Ffrwdgrech
BRECON
Powys
LD3 8LD
- Phone:
- 07470475181
- Email:
- gregsbrecon12@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window