Financial history FOREST OF DEAN DOG RESCUE

Charity Number: 1172913
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £59.16k £66.94k £55.46k £122.88k £68.61k
Total expenditure £52.48k £39.79k £69.84k £67.04k £65.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A