Accounts and annual returns COLD ASTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1172958
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 20 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 20 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 28 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 28 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 24 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 24 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 01 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 01 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 25 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 25 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window