Trustees COLD ASTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 1172958

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Ruth Parkes | Chair | 23 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Campbell-Meiklejohn | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Deborah Davies | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Clare Carroll | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Hadland | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sally Elizabeth Morris | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Annette Ziles | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clare Rosemary Saunders | Trustee | 23 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA RUTH SLACK | Trustee | 11 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
JEFFREY MCNALLY | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.