Financial history RUSTON SPORTS AND SOCIAL CLUB

Charity Number: 1173964
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £82.75k £85.92k £155.99k £138.59k £156.81k
Total expenditure £74.78k £86.71k £101.03k £79.61k £116.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £46.24k £27.85k N/A N/A