HISTORIC RYDE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity runs The Museum of Ryde, a museum of records, articles and artefacts relating to the history of Ryde and its people. The Museum of Ryde also incorporates the Donald McGill Postcard Museum, dedicated to the postcard artist.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 26 July 2017: CIO registration
- 14 November 2018: Funds received from 1153947 HISTORIC RYDE SOCIETY
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brian Harris | Chair | 27 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jocelyn Cooper | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Brooks | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sandy Harris | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alan Brading | Trustee | 27 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Joseph O'Driscoll | Trustee | 27 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Lawrence | Trustee | 27 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.62k | £18.82k | £30.06k | £8.90k | £15.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.78k | £16.45k | £15.53k | £15.77k | £20.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.51k | £26.34k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Jul 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF RYDE IN PARTICULAR BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A HERITAGE CENTRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Museum of Ryde
Royal Victoria Arcade
Union Street
Ryde
Isle of Wight
PO33 2LQ
- Phone:
- 01983 717435
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window