HUNGERFORD LIBRARY AND COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operate and maintain the former West Berkshire Library Building (now known as The HUB) for community of Hungerford. Encourage and support local groups by increasing usage of the building. Establish charitable events for the benefit of the local community of Hungerford and surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £9,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 08 August 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEITH ROBERT KNIGHT | Chair | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Kathleen Mary Rough | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neale Marney | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Sarah Chatters | Trustee | 14 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
christine lynne HODGKIN | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JANE KAREN SIMPKINS | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.09k | £28.04k | £44.97k | £11.79k | £34.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.94k | £27.98k | £24.28k | £26.41k | £29.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £9.00k | £33.00k | £9.00k | £9.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 07 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 07 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 31 July 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 31 July 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Aug 2017
Charitable objects
1)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN HUNGERFORD BERKSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, BY SUPPORTING AND MAINTAINING THE PROVISION OF A LENDING LIBRARY SERVICE 2)TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF HUNGERFORD BERKSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF A PUBLIC LIBRARY FOR RECREATION AND OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID RESIDENTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hungerford HUB Building
Church Street
HUNGERFORD
Berkshire
RG17 0JG
- Phone:
- 07512 076150
- Email:
- hungerfordhub@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window