THE BOLEH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main aim of the Boleh Trust is to offer sailing opportunities to young people..
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 28 November 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Atkinson-Willes | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Laws | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Craine | Trustee | 13 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
David J Critchley MA | Trustee | 05 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brook White | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Thomas Metcalfe | Trustee | 29 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARK MINSHULL | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
TOBY MARRIS | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE ELIZABETH MIDDLETON | Trustee | 08 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.85k | £72.90k | £50.87k | £93.42k | £107.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.53k | £50.22k | £56.90k | £77.60k | £74.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Nov 2017 as amended on 11 Oct 2021 as amended on 22 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN TRADITIONAL SHIPWRIGHT SKILLS. (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. (C) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS IN LIFE. (2) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE PROMOTION, PRESERVATION AND MAINTENANCE OF BRITISH MARITIME HERITAGE AND, IN PARTICULAR THE PRESERVATION AND MAINTENANCE IN FULL WORKING ORDER OF EXAMPLES OF SAILING VESSELS OF HISTORIC SIGNIFICANCE. (3) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; WITH PARTICULAR EMPHASIS ON PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES OR WHO ARE SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED. (4) THE PROVISION OF SAIL TRAINING AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES FOR MEMBERS OF THE ARMED FORCES AND THEIR FAMILIES FOR THE PURPOSE OF PROMOTING THE WELFARE AND EFFICIENCY OF THE FORCES OF THE CROWN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Samson House
Kelham Gardens
MARLBOROUGH
Wiltshire
SN8 1PW
- Phone:
- 07976 826909
- Email:
- antaw031055@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window