Trustees THE BOLEH TRUST

Charity number: 1175954
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anthony Atkinson-Willes Trustee 12 September 2024
None on record
Christopher John Laws Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Nigel Craine Trustee 13 December 2022
None on record
David J Critchley MA Trustee 05 June 2022
None on record
Brook White Trustee 19 November 2021
None on record
Richard Thomas Metcalfe Trustee 29 October 2019
None on record
MARK MINSHULL Trustee 10 April 2018
None on record
TOBY MARRIS Trustee 10 April 2018
None on record
CAROLINE ELIZABETH MIDDLETON Trustee 08 April 2015
None on record