THE ROCHESTER GOOD STEWARDS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust makes grants to churches to support activities consistent with its objectives, including the provision and maintenance of facilities for public worship, the provision of ministers for the conduct of public worship and provision of pastoral care, outreach and evangelism, and the promotion of awareness and understanding of the doctrine of the Church of England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bexley
- Bromley
- East Sussex
- Kent
- Medway
- West Sussex
Governance
- 18 August 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benedict Leonard | Trustee | 24 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mark Puckett | Trustee | 31 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Bratby | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAUL MICHAEL FREEMAN | Trustee | 18 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev MICHAEL PHILIP WARREN | Trustee | 18 May 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.38k | £52.91k | £14.25k | £34.00k | £40.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.59k | £27.79k | £22.79k | £25.04k | £45.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 February 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 February 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 February 2021 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Aug 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, AS THIS IS SET FORTH IN THE DOCTRINE OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC RESIDING IN THE DIOCESES OF ROCHESTER, CANTERBURY AND CHICHESTER, BY SUPPORTING, THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND OTHERWISE, A) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF FACILITIES FOR PUBLIC WORSHIP, B) THE PROVISION OF MINISTERS FOR THE CONDUCT OF PUBLIC WORSHIP AND PROVISION OF PASTORAL CARE, C) OUTREACH AND EVANGELISATION, AND D) THE PROMOTION OF THE AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE DOCTRINE OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND. THE DOCTRINE OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IS FOR THESE PURPOSES TO BE CONSTRUED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND (WORSHIP AND DOCTRINE) MEASURE 1974 AS ORIGINALLY ENACTED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St.Johns Church
Amherst Road
TUNBRIDGE WELLS
TN4 9LG
- Phone:
- 01892540897
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window