Financial history OAK COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity Number: 1174870
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/04/2020 04/04/2021 04/04/2022 04/04/2023 04/04/2024
Total gross income £37.66k £36.00k £42.25k £35.43k £32.36k
Total expenditure £42.52k £51.00k £38.59k £30.96k £39.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A