MUSEUM OF RAF FIRE FIGHTING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To establish and maintain for the benefit of the public a museum of RAF fire fighting. To advance education by establishing a museum which details the history of the RAF fire and rescue and to promote community fire safety. Also to advance education by displaying fire fighting memorabilia in and outside the museum to promote community fire safety. Also to Promote Education on fire safety.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
38 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 09 May 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Munro | Trustee | 30 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
KIM SHIRLEY | Trustee | 09 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN SHIRLEY | Trustee | 09 May 2017 |
|
|||||
COLIN TASKER | Trustee | 09 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Grant | Trustee | 30 January 2001 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.36k | £25.95k | £43.72k | £22.44k | £14.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.54k | £18.16k | £26.99k | £21.75k | £25.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 February 2021 | 101 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 February 2021 | 101 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 09 May 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC A MUSEUM OF FIRE FIGHTING FOCUSSING IN PARTICULAR ON THE WORK OF THE RAF FIRE AND RESCUE SERVICE; TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A MUSEUM WHICH DETAILS THE HISTORY OF THE RAF FIRE AND RESCUE SERVICE AND PROMOTES COMMUNITY FIRE SAFETY; TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY PUBLICLY DISPLAYING FIRE FIGHTING MEMORABILIA OUTSIDE OF THE MUSEUM TO SUPPORT AND PROMOTE THE MUSEUM AND TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY FIRE SAFETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 RUTLAND WAY
SCAMPTON
LINCOLN
LN1 2UJ
- Phone:
- 01522730198
- Email:
- enquiry@firemuseum.co.uk
- Website:
-
firemuseum.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window