THE INTERNATIONAL FUTURE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- South Africa
Governance
- 14 March 2019: CIO registration
- THE FUTURE FOUNDATION (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MATTHEW WILLIAM TURNER | Chair | 12 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Boshoff | Trustee | 11 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bethany Laws | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE ALAN FISHER ACA | Trustee | 12 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £540 | £52 | £26 | £5 | £28 | |
|
Total expenditure | £153 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 May 2022 | 197 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 May 2022 | 197 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 March 2021 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 May 2022 | 562 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND SOUTH AFRICA, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: · PROVIDING SUPPLIES, EQUIPMENT AND INFRASTRUCTURE TO SCHOOLS IN THE UK AND SOUTH AFRICA; · FACILITATING READING CLUBS; · PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL TALKS AND WORKSHOPS IN SCHOOLS AND NURSERY SETTINGS; AND · ENCOURAGING SCHOOL ATTENDANCE IN DISADVANTAGED AREAS IN SOUTH AFRICA, BY ADVOCATING THE BENEFITS OF FORMAL EDUCATION AND FACILITATING ATTENDANCE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT (SUCH AS SCHOOL UNIFORMS) TO CHILDREN WHO MIGHT OTHERWISE STRUGGLE TO PARTICIPATE THROUGH LACK OF MEANS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE FUTURE FOUNDATION
1-7 STATION ROAD
CRAWLEY
WEST SUSSEX
RH10 1HT
- Phone:
- 07545825492
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window