THEATRUM MUNDI

Charity number: 1174149
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Theatrum Mundi's charitable aim is improving the understanding of cities through education and research. We convene practitioners and scholars in workshops, seminars, public events, and creative projects. We also publish independently and through other platforms. Established now as a charity based in London, our projects and programmes operate internationally with a wide range of partners.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £145,413
Total expenditure: £196,394

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England
  • France
  • Greece
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 August 2017: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Seth Amani Scafe-Smith Chair 18 May 2021
None on record
Chloe Tze Ru Spiby Loh Trustee 18 May 2021
None on record
Sepideh Karami Trustee 18 May 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £190.25k £439.52k £418.76k £387.00k £145.41k
Total expenditure £357.89k £382.36k £378.96k £426.00k £196.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 19 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 19 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 01 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
15 A Clerkenwell Close
London
EC1R 0AA
Phone:
0000000000