THE MORGAN (GENERAL) CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To hold capital and income for the purposes of making charitable donations or voluntary donations as the Trustees require
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 July 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD IAN MORGAN | Chair | 09 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA MORGAN | Trustee | 09 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.00k | £6.00k | £6.00k | £6.00k | £6.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £500 | £145 | £7.55k | £10.56k | £5.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME, AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL, AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER TO ADVANCE, OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF, SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Meridian Private Client Llp
Wood Rydings Court
Packington Lane
Meriden
COVENTRY
CV7 7HN
- Phone:
- 01675442430
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window