Financial history SHIRLEY CHRISTADELPHIAN ECCLESIA

Charity number: 1176468
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £32.56k £43.28k £38.40k £32.50k £44.67k
Total expenditure £48.07k £20.69k £29.20k £38.08k £47.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A