SHIRLEY CHRISTADELPHIAN ECCLESIA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our meetings include two each Sunday, one for sharing bread and wine, the other for preaching the Gospel. A meeting is held each Tuesday evening for Bible study. Other proclamation meetings are held from time to time. There are regular activities for all ages. There is practical support for elderly members, the sick and those with particular needs. We support preaching and charities in Africa.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Solihull
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 02 January 2018: Standard registration
- SHIRLEY CHRISTADELPHIANS (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Scott | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joe Harris | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Pearce | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Duncan James Movassaghi | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Riddell | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
ALLEN PAUL | Trustee | 16 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPH MULLEN | Trustee | 16 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.56k | £43.28k | £38.40k | £32.50k | £44.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.07k | £20.69k | £29.20k | £38.08k | £47.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 08 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 08 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE: TO ADVANCE BIBLE-BASED CHRISTIAN FAITH TO THE GLORY OF GOD AND THE HONOUR OF JESUS CHRIST IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CHRISTADELPHIAN BIRMINGHAM AMENDED STATEMENT OF FAITH, AS ATTACHED, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE CHRISTADELPHIAN COMMUNITY AND MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC, PARTICULARLY IN AND AROUND SHIRLEY THROUGH ACTIVITIES WHICH INCLUDE BUT ARE NOT LIMITED TO: HOLDING MEETINGS, OPEN TO THE PUBLIC, FOR WORSHIP, PRAYER, BREAKING OF BREAD BY CHRISTADELPHIANS AND BIBLE TEACHING; PREACHING TO THE PUBLIC THROUGH PERSONAL ENGAGEMENT AND/OR BY INVITATIONS TO PREACHING/TEACHING MEETINGS AND/OR BY OTHER MEANS; ENGAGING WITH THE LOCAL PUBLIC THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUNDAY SCHOOL AND/OR YOUTH CLUB(S) AND/OR OTHER OCCASIONAL ACTIVITIES; ENGAGING WITH THE WIDER CHRISTADELPHIAN COMMUNITY AND WIDER PUBLIC THROUGH PERIODIC COLLECTIONS FOR CHARITABLE NEEDS, INCLUDING COLLECTIONS FOR DISASTER RELIEF; AND SERVING, TO THE EXTENT FEASIBLE, THE PASTORAL AND OTHER WELFARE NEEDS OF ECCLESIAL MEMBERS AND OTHERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Christadelphian Hall
Church Road
Shirley
Solihull
B90 2AX
- Phone:
- 01217452480
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window