Accounts and annual returns MIND BODY CONNECT (MBC)
Charity number: 1173834

Charity reporting is up to date (124 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 13 July 2023 | 14 September 2024 | 124 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 July 2023 | 14 September 2024 | 124 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 13 July 2022 | 26 April 2024 | 349 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 July 2022 | 26 April 2024 | 349 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 13 July 2021 | 22 December 2022 | 223 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 July 2021 | 22 December 2022 | 223 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 13 July 2020 | 11 September 2021 | 121 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 July 2020 | 11 September 2021 | 121 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 13 July 2019 | 08 January 2021 | 240 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 July 2019 | 08 January 2021 | 240 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window