MIND BODY CONNECT (MBC)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Founded in 2014, MBC empowers marginalised communities through the medium of exercise. Our current exercise repertoire includes therapeutic yoga, strongman, powerlifting and climbing. We work with recovering addicts, survivors of human trafficking and homeless young adults. We support our long standing service users to gain qualifications and employment delivering our programme.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 13 July 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 July 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRIS FITZGERALD | Chair | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mark Hollett | Trustee | 06 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Adamson | Trustee | 06 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Smith | Trustee | 29 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Guy Sewell | Trustee | 07 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr RUTH BARLEY | Trustee | 28 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 13/07/2019 | 13/07/2020 | 13/07/2021 | 13/07/2022 | 13/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.61k | £13.35k | £1.14k | £10.45k | £8.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.34k | £4.55k | £10.02k | £9.04k | £7.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £685 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 13 July 2023 | 14 September 2024 | 124 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 July 2023 | 14 September 2024 | 124 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 13 July 2022 | 26 April 2024 | 349 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 July 2022 | 26 April 2024 | 349 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 13 July 2021 | 22 December 2022 | 223 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 July 2021 | 22 December 2022 | 223 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 13 July 2020 | 11 September 2021 | 121 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 July 2020 | 11 September 2021 | 121 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 13 July 2019 | 08 January 2021 | 240 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 July 2019 | 08 January 2021 | 240 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Jul 2017
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF MARGINALISED GROUPS BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR SPORT AND RECREATION AND GROUP SPORTS AND EXERCISE DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND PROMOTE AND PROTECT THEIR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH. 2) THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND COACHING TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO TAKE PART IN THE SPORTS OF WEIGHTLIFTING AND POWERLIFTING. 3) TO UNDERTAKE RESEARCH INTO THE EFFECTS OF EXERCISE ON PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE “MARGINALISED GROUPS” ARE DEFINED AS GROUPS WHO FALL INTO THE FOLLOWING CATEGORIES: RECOVERING ADDICTS, SURVIVORS OF HUMAN TRAFFICKING AND DOMESTIC VIOLENCE, PEOPLE WITH EATING DISORDERS, PEOPLE ON PROBATION AND HOMELESS PEOPLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
92 HEAVYGATE ROAD
SHEFFIELD
S10 1PF
- Phone:
- 07879814396
- Email:
- mindbodyconnectuk@gmail.com
- Website:
-
Pending
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window