ST LEONARD'S (WALTON-LE-DALE) C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 01 January 1961: Standard registration
- 13 November 1996: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 SEPTEMBER 1977 AMENDED 8 NOVEMBER 1978 AMENDED 31 JANUARY 1980
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISIONOF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION OF THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY) BY A) FOSTERING MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL AND B) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATON OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.