WALBERSWICK VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity maintains and runs the hall which is used by local people for activities such as WI, Children's film club, Local History Group, Bridge, Painting, Yoga and Pilates. Plays and pantomimes are performed as well as other entertainments and interests. It is also hired for wedding and funeral receptions and other events. The Post office uses the hall annexe twice a week to serve local people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 12 May 2017: CIO registration
- 15 October 2017: Funds received from 1100032 WALBERSWICK VILLAGE HALL
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mitchell Pocock | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Jane WILSON | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Lynch | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Charles Pellew LOVICK | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Gomm | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Watson | Trustee | 10 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID NEEVES | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
FRANK WOODCRAFT | Trustee | 11 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.70k | £18.36k | £8.35k | £25.71k | £26.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.03k | £10.36k | £11.87k | £15.09k | £17.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2023
(These accounts |
30 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 August 2021 | 303 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 August 2021 | 303 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 May 2017
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH AND RUN A VILLAGE HALL AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF WALBERSWICK AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD ('THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF THE LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Manor Close
Walberswick
Walberswick
Southwold
Suffolk
- Phone:
- 01502723142
- Email:
- alvivhunt@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window