ADVENTURE THERAPY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE EXIST TO IMPROVE THE EMOTIONAL AND PHYSICAL WELLBEING OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS WITH MENTAL HEALTH CONDITIONS, LEARNING DISABILITY, PHYSICAL DISABILITY, LIFE-THREATENING OR SHORTENING ILLNESSES AND LIFE-CHANGING CONDITIONS, THROUGH OUTDOOR AND ADVENTURE-LED ACTIVITIES. OUR ACTIVITIES STRENGTHEN RESILIENCE, IMPROVE VITALITY AND SELF ESTEEM AND PROVIDE A SENSE OF ACCOMPLISHMENT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
33 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Devon
- Somerset
Governance
- 03 July 2017: CIO registration
- Adventure Academy (Working name)
- Challenge Ahead (Working name)
- Wilderness Project (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Geoffrey Alan Hills | Chair | 03 July 2017 |
|
|||||
Amber Jayne Gammon | Trustee | 17 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
DEAN MATTHEW RICKY GAMMON | Trustee | 03 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.98k | £53.57k | £60.07k | £61.52k | £93.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.80k | £16.71k | £35.16k | £62.02k | £71.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £693 | £3.37k | £950 | £6.13k | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 16 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 16 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Jul 2017
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE OR DIFFICULTY INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED BY: (1) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES, PROVIDED IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL- WELFARE WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF SKILLS, CAPABILITIES AND CONFIDENCE AS A MEANS OF THERAPY AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INSTRUCTION AND FACILITIES IN OUTDOOR/ADVENTURE PURSUITS AND OTHER RELATED ACTIVITIES. (3) TO ENABLE THE ACCESS OF AND ABILITY TO CARRY OUT SUCH ACTIVITIES AS DEEMED SUPPORTIVE IN AIDING RECOVERY AND/OR QUALITY OF LIFE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SPECIALIST EQUIPMENT OR GRANTS TO ENABLE THE PURCHASE OF SUCH EQUIPMENT. (4) THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR THE SAVING OF LIVES, BY RAISING AWARENESS OF AND CARRYING OUT RESEARCH IN THE THERAPEUTIC BENEFITS OF OUTDOOR/ADVENTURE PURSUITS AND OTHER RELATED ACTIVITIES. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE OR DIFFICULTY MEANS: LIFE-CHANGING OR LIFE-LIMITING CONDITIONS, MENTAL ILLNESS, PHYSICAL DISABILITY OR IMPAIRMENT OR LEARNING DIFFICULTIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Seaview Estate
ILFRACOMBE
EX34 9PP
- Phone:
- 01271865285
- Email:
- info@adventuretherapy.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window