Trustees WALTHAM ABBEY U3A
Charity number: 1173927
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda Jillian Miles | Chair | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carol Eileen Williams | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Roland Peacock | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Margaret Cush | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Peggy Woods | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
JEAN MCALPIN | Trustee | 03 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Sheila Ellen Baccarini | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Elizabeth Wilson | Trustee | 08 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
TERENCE PETER KNIGHT | Trustee | 10 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA JANE PHILLIPS | Trustee | 09 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN PIEKUTA | Trustee | 09 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
DOREEN STIRRUP | Trustee | 08 May 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.