NET-REACH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a UK based charity and can teach you online regardless of where you live. We pride ourselves on providing creative, educational delivery using online, face to face classes, paying careful attention to each students needs. Our programmes are developed for the individual and delivered by experienced, DBS checked teachers. Lessons are delivered online or at our Tutor Centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 27 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 March 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CARROLL EMLYN-JONES NUNNERLY | Chair | 21 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Antoinette Bosley | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vernon Price | Trustee | 21 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
RODERICK JAMES WALTON BURDON | Trustee | 21 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Linda Tame | Trustee | 21 October 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 27/09/2019 | 27/09/2020 | 27/09/2021 | 27/09/2022 | 27/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.18k | £6.14k | £6.08k | £4.32k | £8.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.54k | £7.00k | £10.76k | £6.10k | £7.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £2.50k | N/A | £1.60k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.75k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 27 September 2023 | 27 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 September 2023 | 27 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 27 September 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 September 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 27 September 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 September 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 27 September 2020 | 02 August 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 September 2020 | 24 July 2023 | 727 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 27 September 2019 | 28 July 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 September 2019 | 28 July 2020 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT FOR ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING PERSONS: (I) STUDENTS FROM THE AGES 11 - 18 WHO FIND THEMSELVES EXCLUDED FROM A SCHOOLING ESTABLISHMENT OR LEARNING ENVIRONMENT. (II) VULNERABLE ADULTS BETWEEN THE AGES OF 18 - 60 THAT FALL INTO THE CATEGORY OF NEET STUDENTS OR ARE LOW-WAGED AND IN POVERTY AND UNABLE TO ACCESS FREE EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Tutor Centre
The Old Village School
Llanwrda
Carmarthenshire
SA19 8HD
- Phone:
- 01550777701
- Email:
- RODBURDON9@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window