Financial history RENEW WELLBEING

Charity number: 1173963
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £103.85k £68.24k £122.11k £115.86k £114.34k
Total expenditure £58.67k £78.25k £77.81k £122.14k £135.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A