OSHI'S WORLD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Oshi's World fund and create inclusive events/activities/performances for people with disabilities with a specific focus on music and the arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bridgend
- Cardiff
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 21 August 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bethan Claire Grant | Chair | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julia Lousie Elliot | Trustee | 04 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
BETHAN SARA MCMINN | Trustee | 25 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
AIMEE JAYNE BOUSIE | Trustee | 25 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
HELEN MURPHY | Trustee | 16 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
RHIAN MURPHY | Trustee | 16 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.81k | £1.36k | £4.12k | £2.67k | £3.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.39k | £3.90k | £5.50k | £3.86k | £3.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 19 February 2021 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 FEB 2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 06 JUL 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10 JUL 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14 AUG 2017 as amended on 27 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
The promotion of social inclusion among people with disabilities, who are excluded from society, or parts of society due to their disability, in particular, but not exclusively by providing opportunities to encourage play, access theatre and the arts, social networking and support in a safe and accessible environment.
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 Burlington Street
Barry
CF63 3NW
- Phone:
- 07539466399
- Email:
- anna@oshisworld.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window