Financial history SHALOM AGAPE COMMUNITY CHURCH (SACC)

Charity number: 1175872
Charity reporting is up to date (78 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £1.05k £3.60k £3.26k £9.02k £15.00k
Total expenditure £1.50k £9.40k £6.00k £7.10k £11.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A