Accounts and annual returns VCMI UK

Charity number: 1173879
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 21 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 21 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 13 February 2025 350 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 21 February 2025 358 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 07 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 07 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 23 March 2022 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 March 2022 23 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 16 November 2021 261 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 08 December 2021 283 days late Download Open in new window