PRICKLES AND PAWS HEDGEHOG RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Prickles and Paws Hedgehog Rescue is dedicated to the rescue, rehabilitation and release of native British hedgehogs. We admit hedgehogs from all over Cornwall and into Devon, working closely with vets and the RSPCA. A helpline is provided for both the public and vets. We attend events and offer educational talks, workshops and run a research program to improve hedgehog care and conservation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
Governance
- 12 September 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daren Colin Thomas | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Colette Beckham | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Budd | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kristy Pauline Maki Gouldsmith CIPP/E LLM | Trustee | 27 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
DIANE ELIZABETH SOUTH BED HONS | Trustee | 12 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.69k | £99.91k | £72.06k | £113.35k | £188.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.40k | £49.12k | £75.28k | £76.10k | £92.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £500 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Sep 2017
Charitable objects
1)FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO FURTHER THE CONSERVATION AND PRESERVATION OF THE HEDGEHOG SPECIES IN CORNWALL AND THE SOUTH-WEST. 2)FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF HEDGEHOGS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY PROVIDING RESCUE, CARE AND REHABILITATION SERVICE FOR SICK, INJURED, OR ORPHANED HEDGEHOGS WITH THE AIM OF RELEASING SUCH HEDGEHOGS BACK INTO THE WILD WHEREVER POSSIBLE. 3)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE STUDY OF HEDGEHOGS AND THE CARE, METHODS OF TREATMENT, CONSERVATION AND HABITAT OF HEDGEHOGS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
55 CHYNOWEN PARC
CUBERT
NEWQUAY
TR8 5HD
- Phone:
- 01637831299
- Email:
- hello@pricklesandpaws.org
- Website:
-
pricklesandpaws.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window