Trustees THE BARTRAM MEMORIAL TRUST (SOUTHREPPS)
Charity number: 1172931
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MALCOLM GEOFFREY HILSON OBE | Chair | 10 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sian Jacqueline Mary Reading | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Diocese of Norwich | Trustee | 10 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN AUSTIN RICHARDS | Trustee | 08 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ALICE MARY PEAL | Trustee | 29 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH C BAILEY | Trustee | 10 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOAN PIKE | Trustee | 01 December 1993 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.